« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-001889
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
2/9/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael A Bosco
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
MARK BOSCO
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Wells Fargo Bank N A
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Jason Sherman
Party Name
Fermin D Sedillo
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Ingrid-Joy Warrick
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2006
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
12/7/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
12/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2006
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/8/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING DIVISION OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
11/17/2006
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC
Filing Date
11/17/2006
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
LEGAL/ OF STERLING ASSET RECOVERY
Filing Date
11/16/2006
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
11/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHRISTOPHER R PERRY
Filing Date
10/26/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE OF DISVOERY
Filing Date
10/23/2006
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/23/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2006
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
10/17/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Filing Date
10/13/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/17/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
10/13/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
10/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2006
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2006
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/3/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/4/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RECONSIDER APPLICANT SEDILLO'S APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS AND TO RESET THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
9/29/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/29/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2006
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
9/27/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2006
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/27/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF APPLICANT FERMIN D SEDILLO
Filing Date
8/30/2006
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
8/30/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2006
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2006
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
8/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
EVIDENTIRAY HEARING AND ACCCOMPANYING DEADLINES/MOTION TO ACCELERATE HEARING VIA TELEPHONE
Filing Date
8/18/2006
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
8/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS FILED ON BEHALF OF FERMIN SEDILLO BY ATTORNEY WARRICK. PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B), ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
6/27/2006
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
6/27/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
6/2/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2006
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
5/17/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2006
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
5/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
5/16/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
5/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 05/06/06
Filing Date
5/12/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/16/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2006
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
4/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/7/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INCS APPLICATION FO RRELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
3/29/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/30/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812
Filing Date
3/28/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/30/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 02/09/06
Filing Date
3/28/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/30/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/13/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
2/9/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/13/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/13/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/16/2006
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/28/2006
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/15/2006
Time
11:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/22/2006
Time
11:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/3/2006
Time
11:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/1/2006
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.