« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-001728
Judge:
Coffey, Rodrick
File Date:
2/6/2006
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
First American Title Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jason Sherman
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
10/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/29/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
COPY OF RECORDED AFFIDAVIT TERMINATING JOINT TENANCY WITH RIGHTS OF SURVIVORSHIP
Filing Date
9/18/2006
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/15/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
8/8/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
8/10/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 6/20/06
Filing Date
7/19/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
7/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF COLLECTION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY SIGNED BY CRYSTAL F FAVOUR
Filing Date
7/19/2006
Description
FTA - Osc Re: Failure To Attend Jury Service
Docket Date
7/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SWORN AFFIDAVIT OF CRYSTAL F FAVOUR THE TRUE PARTY IN INTEREST RELATING TO HER RECEIPT OF A CONFORMED COPY OF THE APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
7/14/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
7/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF ROBERT S FAVOUR JR
Filing Date
6/9/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/12/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
2/24/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/27/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TREASURER OF MARICOPA COUNTY SERVED 02/7/06
Filing Date
2/24/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/1/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/8/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.