« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-092916
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
8/9/2005
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Ctc Real Estate Services
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jeremy Bergstrom
Party Name
(2)Maricopa County Treasurers Office
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Gilberto G Alvarez
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Natalie Alverez
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
8/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
7/25/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/28/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
7/21/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
7/24/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/10/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/28/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
4/6/2006
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/6/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(3)
NOTE:
CHICAGO TITLE TRUSTEE SALE GUARANTEE-ARIZONA/ PAID
Filing Date
9/2/2005
Description
CRT - Certification Of Mailing
Docket Date
9/13/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/25/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 08/11/05
Filing Date
8/24/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/26/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/11/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/11/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.