« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-092121
Judge:
Thompson, Peter
File Date:
5/27/2005
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Recon Trust Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jeremy Bergstrom
Party Name
(2)Maricopa County Treasurers Office
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Village Park I I - A Homeowners Association
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Jonathan Olcott
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
8/31/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
9/1/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
8/15/2006
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
7/10/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SWORN AFFIDAVIT OF OCTAVIO GOMEZ LOPEZ THE TRUE PARTY IN INEREST RELATING TO HIS RECEIPT OF A CONFORMED COPY OF THE APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
6/21/2006
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
BANKRUPTCY CASE INFORMATION REGARDING OCTAVIO LOPEZ THE TRUE PARTY IN INTEREST RELATING TO LIEN BY CATHERINE MCHUGH
Filing Date
5/16/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
5/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/28/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
10/3/2005
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
10/11/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
9/8/2005
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
9/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RELEASING EXCESS PROCEEDS PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812(G)
Filing Date
9/6/2005
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
9/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RELEASING EXCESS PROCEEDS PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812(G)
Filing Date
8/31/2005
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING EXCESS PROCEEDS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. 33-812
Filing Date
7/15/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/26/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
7/15/2005
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
7/28/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 07/15/05
Filing Date
7/6/2005
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
7/7/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MAILING
Filing Date
6/23/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/27/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR EXCESS PROCEEDS/PAID
Filing Date
6/17/2005
Description
CRT - Certification Of Mailing
Docket Date
7/5/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLAINT
Filing Date
6/7/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/9/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-2-05
Filing Date
6/7/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/10/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/31/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/31/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.