« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-091783
Judge:
Thompson, Peter
File Date:
5/3/2005
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
C T C Real Estate Services
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jeremy Bergstrom
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
12/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
11/7/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
6/13/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/9/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
5/10/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/11/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/26/2006
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
4/26/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/1/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
2/1/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/1/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2005
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
5/31/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MAILING COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/9/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 5/4/05
Filing Date
5/9/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 5/4/05
Filing Date
5/3/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/4/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/4/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.