« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-091477
Judge:
Thompson, Peter
File Date:
4/11/2005
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
C T C Real Estate Services
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jeremy Bergstrom
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
Claimant
Sex
Attorney
Eric Sparks
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2008
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
1/15/2008
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR COURTS RECONSIDERATION OF APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
1/15/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNT SERVED ON 12/04/2007`
Filing Date
1/15/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
1/3/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/2/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
11/23/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATE CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
11/23/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS, PAID
Filing Date
3/22/2006
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/11/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2005
Description
CRT - Certification Of Mailing
Docket Date
5/12/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/18/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/19/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 4/14/05
Filing Date
4/18/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/20/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/12/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.