« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-090997
Judge:
Thompson, Peter
File Date:
3/11/2005
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Ctc Real Estate Services
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jeremy Bergstrom
Party Name
(2)Maricopa County Treasurers Office
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Karen Bishop
Relationship
Claimant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
6/20/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
6/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2007
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
6/12/2007
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
6/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
6/12/2007
Filing Party
Claimant(3)
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF SALE
Filing Date
6/7/2007
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT FOR COLLECTION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
6/7/2007
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT FOR COLLECTION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
6/7/2007
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLETE COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF JON STEVEN BISHOP
Filing Date
6/6/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT
Filing Date
5/25/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/25/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AND REINSTATING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
5/16/2007
Description
MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment
Docket Date
5/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICANT STERLING ASSET RECOVERY'S DISMISSAL AND REINSTATE CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
5/16/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
STERLING ASSET RECOVEERY'S TO KAREN BISHOP'S APPLICAITON FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
5/15/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
4/26/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/27/2007
Filing Party
Claimant(3)
Filing Date
4/26/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/27/2007
Filing Party
Claimant(3)
NOTE:
AMENDED / TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL
Filing Date
4/11/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL
Filing Date
2/22/2006
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
2/22/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2005
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/14/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2005
Description
CRT - Certification Of Mailing
Docket Date
4/5/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/21/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 3/15/05
Filing Date
3/11/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/14/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/14/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/29/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Hearing
Date
7/12/2007
Time
9:30
Event
Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.