« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-090644
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
2/16/2005
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Ctc Real Estate Services
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jeremy Bergstrom
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Notetrackers L L C
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
WILLIAM JENKINS
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
8/7/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEES SALE
Filing Date
7/31/2006
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE
Filing Date
7/6/2006
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/13/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
6/28/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
6/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2006
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
7/3/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MAILING APPLICATION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE
Filing Date
5/23/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEES SALE/ PAID
Filing Date
5/18/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF DIMISSAL/PAID
Filing Date
2/1/2006
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
2/1/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2005
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
11/23/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2005
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
3/14/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MAILING COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/23/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/24/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/17/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/17/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.