« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-052405
Judge:
Civil Court Admin, Judge
File Date:
9/22/2005
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
First American Title Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Rex Anderson
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Atlantic- American Acceptance Corporation
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Marvin Schenk
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
12/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2007
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
12/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHDRAWING APPLICATION FILED BY ATLANTICE-AMERICAN ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Filing Date
11/26/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
11/29/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODDGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
11/21/2007
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW APPLICATION FILED BY ATLANTIC-AMERICAN ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Filing Date
11/19/2007
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
11/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING STERLING ASSET RECOVERY, INC, TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY THROUGH ITS COUNSEL, J. MARC MONTIJO, AT THE HEARING PRESENTLY SET BEFORE THIS COURT ON 11/26/07 AT 9AM
Filing Date
10/30/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/2/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/2/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/2/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TELEPHONICALLY APPEAR
Filing Date
10/11/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/15/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/5/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2007
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
10/4/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS FILED BY ATLANTIC-AMERICAN ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Filing Date
10/2/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
10/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS FROM TRUSTEES SALE/ PAID
Filing Date
9/21/2007
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
9/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
9/12/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATE CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
9/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
10/27/2006
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
11/7/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/17/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 10/14/05
Filing Date
10/14/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/20/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/27/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/27/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/26/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.