« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-051194
Judge:
Civil Court Admin, Judge
File Date:
6/22/2005
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
First American Title Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Rex Anderson
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Household Realty Corporation
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Christopher Perry
Party Name
Ray Manor Homeowners Association
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
James Hazlewood
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Eric Sparks
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
12/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED ON 10/31/2007
Filing Date
12/4/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
11/6/2007
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
11/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/26/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
12/28/2005
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/3/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIRECTING RELEASE OF EXCESS FUNDS
Filing Date
12/9/2005
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
12/13/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR IMMEDIATE ENTRY OF ORDER
Filing Date
12/8/2005
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
12/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2005
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
12/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2005
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/26/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
9/22/2005
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2005
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/28/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2005
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
8/26/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2005
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
9/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2005
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
8/9/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 07/11/05
Filing Date
7/8/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/14/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
7/8/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 6-22-2005
Filing Date
6/28/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/28/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/28/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.