« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-050617
Judge:
Civil Court Admin, Judge
File Date:
5/6/2005
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Doak Worley
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Charles Franklin
Party Name
Darla Worley
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Charles Franklin
Party Name
Fleetwood Enterprises Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Freightliner L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry Motor Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Freightliner Custom Chassis Corporation
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
John Hendricks
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/23/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
FLEETWOOD ENTERPRISES INC SERVED 05-24-05
Filing Date
6/8/2005
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
6/8/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY MOTOR COMPANY SERVED 5-19-2005
Filing Date
6/3/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY SERVED 5-19-2005
Filing Date
6/3/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/23/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/23/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2005
Description
NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court
Docket Date
6/9/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/2/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
5/23/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/27/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
FREIGHTLINER LLC SERVED 05/10/05
Filing Date
5/23/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/9/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/12/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.