NOTICE!
The system will be down for scheduled maintenance on Sunday, August 02, 2015 from 6:30 PM to 9:30 PM.
« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2005-019010 Judge: Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned
File Date: 12/12/2005 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Bellevue Square Managers Inc   Plaintiff    Barbara Maroney 
Fnp- Bellevue Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Fitigues Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Steven Rosenstein   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Andrea Rosenstein   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/13/2007  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  3/15/2007  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: AND RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN 
12/12/2005  COM - Complaint  12/13/2005   
12/12/2005  CER - Certificate  12/13/2005   
NOTE: OF EXEMPLIFICATION SUPERIOR COURT OF WASHINGTON COUNTY OF KING 
12/12/2005  AFF - Affidavit  12/13/2005   
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY RE FOREIGN JUDGMENT 
12/12/2005  AFM - Affidavit of Service Registerd/Certified Mail  12/13/2005   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Self-Service Center