« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-017127
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
11/3/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jason P Sherman
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jason Sherman
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
J P Morgan Chase Bank
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Christopher Perry
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Kaydie Mason
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Female
Attorney
Julius Harms
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2007
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court
Docket Date
11/16/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/9/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITHDRAWAL
Filing Date
11/6/2006
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
11/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
11/7/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2006
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/3/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
10/4/2006
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
9/18/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPLAINT, APPLICATION FOR PAYMENT OF EXCESS PROCEEDS AND CROSSCLAIM/ PAID
Filing Date
9/15/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
9/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASER OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/PAID
Filing Date
2/7/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/28/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
2/6/2006
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
2/7/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NO OBJECTION
Filing Date
1/17/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
1/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 01/17/06
Filing Date
12/29/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/30/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
12/29/2005
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
1/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
1/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/8/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TREASURER OF MARICOPA COUNTY SERVED 11/03/2005
Filing Date
11/7/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/15/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
11/7/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/7/2006
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.