« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-016020
Judge:
Herrod, Michael
File Date:
10/7/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Laurel Handley
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Brian Newman
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/26/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OPPOSE CLAIM OF STERLING ASSET RECOVERY
Filing Date
5/25/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/25/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/7/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
3/31/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/31/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
4/7/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(3)
Filing Date
3/9/2006
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
3/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2006
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
1/31/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(3)
NOTE:
OF MAILING APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF SALE
Filing Date
1/11/2006
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2006
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
1/11/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(3)
NOTE:
AMENDED / FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF SALE BY OWNER
Filing Date
12/12/2005
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
12/14/2005
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(3)
Filing Date
11/29/2005
Description
WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons
Docket Date
11/30/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 10/25/2005
Filing Date
11/23/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/29/2005
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(3)
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS TO SALE BY OWNER
Filing Date
10/24/2005
Description
CRT - Certification Of Mailing
Docket Date
11/1/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/17/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/17/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/29/2006
Time
9:15
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.