« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-015644
Judge:
Albrecht, Richard
File Date:
10/6/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Unifund C C R Partners
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jennifer Manzi
Party Name
Beverly Ann Petrone
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Robert J Petrone
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Gold Leaf Properties L L C
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
West U S A Realty Inc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2016
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
2/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit for Renewal of Judgment - EFILE BILLING $27.00
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
12/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2015
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
11/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGMENT DISCHARGING GARNISHEE
Filing Date
11/6/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion and Order for Judgment Discharging Garnishee
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2014
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
7/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN ON NONEXEMPT EARNINGS
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF/JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN ON NON-EXEMPT EARNINGS
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(5)
NOTE:
Answer of Garnishee
Filing Date
6/20/2014
Description
CRT - Certification Of Mailing
Docket Date
6/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF/JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S CERTIFICATION OF DELIVERY PURSUANT TO ARS 12-1598.04(D)
Filing Date
6/19/2014
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
7/16/2014
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(5)
Filing Date
6/11/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2014
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
6/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2014
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
6/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2011
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
3/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2007
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
10/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2007
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(4)
Filing Date
8/13/2007
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
8/14/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2007
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
7/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2006
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
6/9/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
4/28/2006
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
5/1/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFIED
Filing Date
4/28/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/1/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/28/2006
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
5/1/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
4/28/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/1/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/15/2006
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
3/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2006
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
3/13/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/19/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEVERLY ANN PETRONE AND ROBERT PETRONE SERVED 10/11/05
Filing Date
10/17/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/20/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CIVIL
Filing Date
10/17/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/20/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO LITIGANTS: REQUIREMENTS TO APPEAL A DECISION OF THE JUSTICE OF THE PEACE
Filing Date
10/17/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/20/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CIVIL
Filing Date
10/6/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2005
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
10/12/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
6/5/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly Ann Petrone
Amount
$22,951.95
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
6/5/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly Ann Petrone
Amount
$16,065.61
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
6/5/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly Ann Petrone
Amount
$633.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Modified
Date
6/5/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly Ann Petrone
Amount
$357.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
6/5/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly Ann Petrone
Amount
$4,500.79
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Modified
Date
6/5/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly Ann Petrone
Amount
$7,580.45
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified