« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-015471
Judge:
Civil Court Adm 01, Calendar
File Date:
9/30/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Todd Jostes
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jeffrey Ostreicher
Party Name
Cami Jostes
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jeffrey Ostreicher
Party Name
Kelcie Jostes
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Full Circle Auto Wash
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2006
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/29/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/8/2006
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
3/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2006
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
1/26/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2006
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
1/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/5/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2005
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
10/5/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.