« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-014725
Judge:
Moskowitz, Frank
File Date:
9/20/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
First American Title Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jason Sherman
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Villa Charme Four Townhouses Association
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Mark Lines
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
2/27/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED
Filing Date
2/15/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/16/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING STIPULATED ORDER
Filing Date
1/27/2006
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/27/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2005
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2005
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
12/23/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DECEMBER 15 2005 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER
Filing Date
12/19/2005
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
12/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/28/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
10/28/2005
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
11/1/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFICATION
Filing Date
10/26/2005
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/28/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING
Filing Date
10/26/2005
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
10/28/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 7.1/ FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER
Filing Date
10/11/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/12/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND PETITION FOR RELEASE OF SURPLUS FUNDS FROM TRUSTEE'S SALE PURSUANT TO A.R.S. 33-812
Filing Date
10/11/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/14/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER
Filing Date
9/26/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/29/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 09/20/05
Filing Date
9/26/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/30/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/22/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/25/2006
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/17/2006
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.