« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-012619
Judge:
Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer
File Date:
8/8/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Mobilisa Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Randall Papetti
Party Name
John Doe
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
W Gorman
Party Name
Charles Lee Mudd
Relationship
Pro Hac Vice
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2011
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit
Docket Date
10/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500 TO DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Filing Date
10/15/2009
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
10/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500.00/ SHERIFFS SALE. JOHN DOE 1 AND SUGGESTION BOX
Filing Date
3/5/2009
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit
Docket Date
3/9/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500.00
Filing Date
3/11/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/13/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED TO WITHDRAW SUBPOENA AND TO DISMISS ACTION
Filing Date
1/10/2008
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2008
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
1/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2008
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
1/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
REMANDED
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
8/31/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2007
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
1/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID A LINEHAN
Filing Date
1/17/2007
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
1/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHAEL K RYAN
Filing Date
1/12/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DAVID A LINEHAN
Filing Date
1/12/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHALE K RYAN
Filing Date
1/9/2007
Description
ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt
Docket Date
1/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2006
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
12/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSMIT THE RECORD ON APPEAL,ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 4,2007
Filing Date
12/11/2006
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
12/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2006
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
10/6/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHIN FIRM
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2006
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
8/30/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2006
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
8/30/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2006
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
8/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2006
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/8/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR RULING ON ITS MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURTS FEBRUARY 27, 2006 ORDER AND DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR A STAY PENDING APPEAL
Filing Date
7/27/2006
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RULING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURTS FEBRUARY 27, 2006 ORDER
Filing Date
7/21/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/25/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DESIGNATION OF TRANSCRIPTS FOR APPEAL
Filing Date
7/21/2006
Description
CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement
Docket Date
7/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2006
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
7/20/2006
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/17/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/20/2006
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF POSTING CASH BOND FOR COSTS ON APPEAL
Filing Date
7/10/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/13/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADOPTING THIS COURTS PREVIOUS MINUTE ENTRY ORDERS DATED DECEMBER 28, 2005 AND FEBRUARY 27, 2006
Filing Date
6/19/2006
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
6/19/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2006
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
6/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING JURISDICTION
Filing Date
6/13/2006
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/15/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENTRY OF ORDER AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE ORDER
Filing Date
6/8/2006
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/12/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT JOHN DOE 1 AND THIRD PARTY THE SUGGESTON BOX'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER FROM WHICH DEFENDANT MAY APPEAL AND 2 MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 27 2006 MINUTE ORDER
Filing Date
5/23/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/26/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF ORDER FROM WHICH DEFENDANT MAY APPEAL
Filing Date
3/29/2006
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/3/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY DISVOCERY IN ANTICIPATION OF FILING PETTITION FOR SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
3/27/2006
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/29/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S TO MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/9/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/10/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STAY DISCOVERY IN ANTICIPATION OF FILING PETITION FOR SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
3/8/2006
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/1/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2006
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
3/7/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN DOE'S IN OPPOSITIOIN TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/23/2006
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION AND SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF CHARLES LEE MUDD JR
Filing Date
2/23/2006
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
2/28/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL OF CHARLES LEE MUDD JR SUBMITTED IN RESPONSE TO RULING OF DECEMBER 28 2005
Filing Date
2/13/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/14/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/ PAID
Filing Date
2/9/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
2/15/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
2/8/2006
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
2/13/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MIBILISA'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING THE ANONYMOUS SPEAKER'S FAILRE TO REPLY TO NOTICE
Filing Date
2/3/2006
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
2/8/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISOCVERY
Filing Date
2/3/2006
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
2/8/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/3/2006
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
2/8/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHARLES LEE MUDD JR
Filing Date
1/4/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2006
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
1/10/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHARLES LEE MUDD JR
Filing Date
12/5/2005
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/5/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2005
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/16/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ASSOCIATION COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
10/27/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/1/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY
Filing Date
10/20/2005
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
10/20/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2005
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/13/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY
Filing Date
10/3/2005
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
10/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/30/2005
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/4/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE ORDER
Filing Date
9/30/2005
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/18/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/2/2005
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/7/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/2/2005
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/13/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2005
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
8/18/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUBPONEA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
8/8/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/10/2005
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/8/2005
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
8/10/2005
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO THE SUGGESTION BOX D/B/A THE ANONYMOUSEMAIL.COM
Filing Date
8/8/2005
Description
PRA - Praecipe
Docket Date
8/10/2005
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OUT OF STATE SUBPOENA DEPOSITION
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/14/2005
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/2/2005
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/21/2008
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.