« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-012388
Judge:
Thorson, Erik
File Date:
8/3/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
First American Title Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jason Sherman
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/13/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
7/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/6/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING STERLING ASSET RECOVERY THROUGH ITS COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AS THE HEARING PRESENTLY SET TO BE HEARD ON JULY 10 2006 AT 1:30 P M
Filing Date
6/27/2006
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
6/30/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF HEARING
Filing Date
5/29/2006
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/29/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
5/19/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/23/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREEMENT AND ASSIGNMENT OF INTEEREST BETWEEN STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC AND TRUE PARTIES IN INTEREST
Filing Date
1/13/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
9/1/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/7/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 08/04/05
Filing Date
9/1/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/4/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/4/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/10/2006
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.