« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-012312
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
8/2/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael A Bosco
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Leonard McDonald
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Garden Park Homeowners Association
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Penny Koepke
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Eric Sparks
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
9/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
8/16/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
8/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED
Filing Date
7/16/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
2/21/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SATISFACTION OF ORDER
Filing Date
1/30/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
3/3/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
1/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICANT GARDEN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION'S FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE ORDER DIRECTING TREASURER TO RELEASE EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
9/16/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/20/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 08/02/05
Filing Date
9/16/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/20/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
APLICATION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF EXCESS PROCEEDS DEPOSITED WITH TREASURER/ PAID
Filing Date
8/2/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/5/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/5/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.