Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2005-011949 Judge: Fox, Dewain
File Date: 7/27/2005 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Victor Oppleman   Plaintiff  Male  David Ramras 
Rodney Joffe   Plaintiff  Male  David Ramras 
Jeff Logsdon   Defendant  Male  DAVID TIERNEY 
Kirsten Logsdon   Defendant  Female  DAVID TIERNEY 
James Oshaughnessy   Defendant  Male  DAVID TIERNEY 
Sara Oshaughnessy   Defendant  Female  DAVID TIERNEY 
Mainnerve Inc   Defendant    DAVID TIERNEY 
Sasha Kuczynski   Counter Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Robyn Joffe   Counter Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Martin Jannol   Counter Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Packet Interrogation Inc   Counter Defendant    Pro Per 
Vostrom Inc   Counter Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/28/2006  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  3/14/2006   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
2/21/2006  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  2/23/2006   
2/13/2006  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  2/13/2006   
2/2/2006  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  2/7/2006   
11/29/2005  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  11/29/2005   
11/9/2005  ORD - Order  11/23/2005   
NOTE: PROTECTIVE RE CONFIDENTIALITY 
10/27/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/1/2005   
NOTE: JANE DOE JANNOL SERVED 10/19/05 
10/27/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/1/2005   
NOTE: MARTIN BERNARD JANNOL SERVED 10/19/05 
10/27/2005  SUM - Summons  11/1/2005   
NOTE: ALIAS 
10/27/2005  SUM - Summons  11/3/2005   
NOTE: ALIAS 
10/24/2005  STP - Stipulation  10/27/2005   
NOTE: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIALITY 
10/18/2005  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  10/18/2005   
10/12/2005  REL - Reply  10/18/2005   
NOTE: TO COUNTERCLAIM BY OPPLEMAN JEFFE PACKET INTERROGATION INC AND VOSTROM INC 
10/6/2005  NOT - Notice  10/17/2005   
NOTE: OF CONFLICT IN THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING DATE OF FEBRUARY 13 2006 
8/25/2005  056 - ME: Hearing Set  8/25/2005   
8/18/2005  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  8/23/2005   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' TO PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
8/18/2005  ANS - Answer  8/19/2005   
NOTE: PAID 
8/17/2005  ORD - Order  8/24/2005   
NOTE: THAT PLAINTIFFS MAY SERVE THE COMPLAINT SUMMONS CERTIFICATE ON COMPULSORY ARBITRATION APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ANDORDER TOS HOW CAUSE ON DEFENDANT JAMES AND SARA O'SHAUGHNESSY BY LEAVING COPIES THEREOF WITH THE GATE ATTENDANT OF THEIR RESIDENCE 
8/17/2005  ORD - Order  8/24/2005   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MAY SERVE THE COMPLAINT SUMMONS CERTIFICATE ON CONPULSORY ARBITRATION APLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CUASE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON DEFENANTS JEFF AND KIRSTEN LOGSDON BY LEAVING COPIES THEREOF WITH THE GATE ATTENDANT OF THEIR RESIDENCE 
8/12/2005  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  8/16/2005   
NOTE: JEFF LOGSDON, KIRSTEN LOGSDON, JAMES O'SHAUGHNESSY AND SARA O'SHAUGHNESSY SERVED 08/10/05 
8/12/2005  OSC - Order To Show Cause  8/22/2005   
8/11/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/15/2005   
NOTE: JEFF LOGSDON SERVED 08/09/05 
8/10/2005  MOT - Motion  8/18/2005   
NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE 
8/8/2005  MOT - Motion  8/19/2005   
NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE 
8/5/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/10/2005   
NOTE: MAINNERVE INC SERVED 07/29/05 
7/27/2005  COM - Complaint  7/29/2005   
7/27/2005  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  7/29/2005   
7/27/2005  APL - Application  7/29/2005   
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/19/2005  9:45  Order To Show Cause 
11/22/2005  9:00  Status Conference 
2/13/2006  9:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
2/14/2006  9:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file