« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-011725
Judge:
Moskowitz, Frank
File Date:
7/21/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Quality Loan Service Corp
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
PAUL LEVINE
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
6/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2007
Description
044 - ME: Case Reinstated
Docket Date
6/1/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
5/7/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/9/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
3/30/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
3/30/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATE CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
3/14/2007
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
11/7/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/29/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 07/25/05
Filing Date
7/27/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/25/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2005
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
7/25/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.