« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2005-010920 Judge: Anderson, Arthur
File Date: 7/6/2005 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Artisan Colour Inc   Plaintiff    Sarah Worthington 
Fitigues Incorporated   Defendant    Pro Per 
F N P Scottsdale   Defendant    Pro Per 
Fitigues Holding Company   Defendant    Pro Per 
F N P Servicing Company   Defendant    Pro Per 
Lawrence M Adelman   Defendant  Male  Lashawn Jenkins 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/2/2006  MOT - Motion  10/3/2006   
NOTE: TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENTS 
7/14/2006  MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar  7/17/2006   
6/12/2006  OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar  6/16/2006   
5/31/2006  MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar  6/6/2006   
5/16/2006  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  5/17/2006   
5/3/2006  084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar  5/3/2006   
4/3/2006  MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar  4/5/2006   
2/1/2006  ANS - Answer  2/2/2006   
NOTE: TO AMENDED COMPLAINT/ PAID 
1/20/2006  NOT - Notice  2/2/2006   
NOTE: PRE-JUDGMENT INTERST CALCULATION 
1/20/2006  JUD - Judgment  1/30/2006   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
1/18/2006  AFD - Affidavit On Default  1/19/2006   
NOTE: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT 
1/18/2006  ADE - Application For Default  1/19/2006   
12/13/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  12/14/2005   
12/13/2005  AFF - Affidavit  12/14/2005   
NOTE: SUM CERTAIN 
12/13/2005  MOT - Motion  12/15/2005   
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 
12/7/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  12/7/2005   
9/30/2005  AFD - Affidavit On Default  10/4/2005   
NOTE: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT 
9/30/2005  ADE - Application For Default  10/4/2005   
NOTE: FOR ENTRY 
9/28/2005  AFD - Affidavit On Default  9/29/2005   
NOTE: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT 
9/28/2005  ADE - Application For Default  9/29/2005   
NOTE: FOR ENTRY 
9/15/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/19/2005   
NOTE: FNP SERVICING CO SERVED 09/02/05 
9/15/2005  SUM - Summons  9/21/2005   
8/30/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/1/2005   
NOTE: FITIGUES INC SERVED 08/23/05 
8/30/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/1/2005   
NOTE: FITIGUES HOLDING COMPANY SERVED 08/23/05 
8/30/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/1/2005   
NOTE: FNP SCOTTSDALE INC SERVED 08/23/05 
8/30/2005  SUM - Summons  9/2/2005   
8/30/2005  SUM - Summons  9/2/2005   
8/30/2005  SUM - Summons  9/2/2005   
7/27/2005  AMC - Amended Complaint  8/1/2005   
7/27/2005  NOF - Notice Of Filing  8/3/2005   
NOTE: AMENDED COMPLAINT 
7/21/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/27/2005   
NOTE: LAWRENCE M ADELMAN SERVED 07-11-05 
7/21/2005  SUM - Summons  7/28/2005   
7/6/2005  COM - Complaint  7/6/2005   
7/6/2005  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  7/6/2005   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
1/20/2006  F:Artisan Colour Inc  $6,293.71  One Time  Interest   
  A: F N P Servicing Company         
1/20/2006  F:Artisan Colour Inc  $269.00  One Time  Costs   
  A: F N P Servicing Company         
1/20/2006  F:Artisan Colour Inc  $56,861.52  One Time  Principal   
  A: F N P Servicing Company         
click here for Self-Service Center