« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-008803
Judge:
Moskowitz, Frank
File Date:
5/27/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael A Bosco
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
MARK BOSCO
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Eric Sparks
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
2/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED ON 09/11/2007
Filing Date
9/24/2007
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/28/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2007
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVITS FOR COLLECTION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
9/11/2007
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT FOR COLLECTION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
9/11/2007
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTERS AND ACCEPTANCE OF APPOINT AS PERMANENT GUARDIAN OF MICHAEL CHRISTIPHER BELTRAN FOR ISRAEL MONTIJO; NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF AGREEMENT BETWEEN ISRAEL MONTIJO AND STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC
Filing Date
8/20/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
8/20/2007
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/8/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/9/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 05/27/05
Filing Date
5/27/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/2/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.