« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-008629
Judge:
Fox, Dewain
File Date:
5/25/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Town & Country Title Services Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Christopher Perry
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Eric Sparks
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2008
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
3/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2008
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SERVED ON 12/04/2007
Filing Date
1/15/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
1/8/2008
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
1/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
REFILED PURSUANT TO RULE 38.1(D)
Filing Date
12/21/2007
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2007
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2007
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
12/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT FOR COLLECTION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY SIGNED BY FLORIDALMA E RAMIREZ
Filing Date
11/21/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID / APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
11/21/2007
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
11/28/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2006
Description
WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons
Docket Date
2/14/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 02/09/06
Filing Date
2/1/2006
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
2/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/11/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ASSOCIATION
Filing Date
5/25/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/27/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/27/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.