« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-007121
Judge:
Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer
File Date:
4/28/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael A Bosco
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
MARK BOSCO
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Christina Rukonwitz
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Esperanza Rukonwitz
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
1/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
1/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2006
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond
Docket Date
12/19/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
11/30/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
12/4/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(4)
Filing Date
11/7/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/14/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(3)
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF SALE BY OWNER FILED 5/16/06
Filing Date
11/1/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
11/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 09/19/06
Filing Date
9/15/2006
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
9/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/14/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
5/19/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/22/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(4)
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS OF SALE BY OWNER/ DEFERRED
Filing Date
5/19/2006
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
5/23/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2006
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
5/24/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(4)
Filing Date
2/15/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 04/28/05
Filing Date
4/29/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/6/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/2/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.