« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-006961
Judge:
Warner, Randall
File Date:
4/26/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Lee Crosby
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
G Crosby
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2007
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
4/24/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2007
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPARTE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
4/11/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
4/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
2/23/2007
Description
MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment
Docket Date
2/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND REINSTATE CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
2/15/2007
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
2/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MAILING AND AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLAINCE WITH ARS SECTION 33-812
Filing Date
2/15/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
10/16/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/17/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/PAID
Filing Date
5/10/2006
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/27/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/3/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2005
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2005
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/23/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRUSTEE UNSIGNED
Filing Date
6/16/2005
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/16/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2005
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/11/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/3/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 04/27/05
Filing Date
4/29/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/29/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/29/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/16/2007
Time
11:15
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.