« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-006634
Judge:
Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer
File Date:
4/20/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
T D Service Company Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Laurel Handley
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
8/24/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2006
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/13/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
6/26/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 05/31/06
Filing Date
5/25/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2006
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/31/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICANT'S FOR REINSTATEMENT
Filing Date
5/16/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
5/16/2006
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
5/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNTIL ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS IS SIGNED BY THIS COURT
Filing Date
5/16/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS SIGNED BY SONIA LOPEZ AND PEDRO PEDILLA CORONADO
Filing Date
5/16/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 02/22/06
Filing Date
5/15/2006
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/9/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/10/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
2/15/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2006
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/23/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREEMENT AND ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST BETWEEN STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC AND TRUE PARTY IN INTEREST
Filing Date
1/12/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
6/3/2005
Description
WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons
Docket Date
6/13/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 04/25/05
Filing Date
5/2/2005
Description
DEC - Declarations
Docket Date
5/9/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FOR DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO ARIZONA REVISED STATUTES SECTION 33-812
Filing Date
4/20/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/22/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.