Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2005-006465 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Coffey
File Date: 4/20/2005 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Pete Bell   Plaintiff  Male  John Torgenson 
Sabin Burrell   Defendant  Male  Richard Goldberg 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/28/2008  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  5/2/2008   
7/19/2006  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  7/21/2006   
5/22/2006  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry  5/22/2006   
4/18/2006  RES - Response  4/19/2006   
NOTE: OPPOSING PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERDEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR 
3/31/2006  MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar  4/3/2006   
3/29/2006  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  3/29/2006   
3/27/2006  ARA - Arbitration Award  5/1/2006   
3/6/2006  084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar  3/6/2006   
2/15/2006  399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award  2/15/2006   
2/1/2006  399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award  2/1/2006   
9/21/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  9/21/2005   
8/26/2005  324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator  8/26/2005   
8/16/2005  REL - Reply  8/22/2005   
NOTE: TO COUNTERCLAIM 
7/27/2005  ANS - Answer  7/29/2005   
NOTE: AND COUNTERCLAIM/PAID 
7/20/2005  AFD - Affidavit On Default  7/22/2005   
7/20/2005  ADE - Application For Default  7/22/2005   
6/3/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/9/2005   
NOTE: SABIN BURRELL SERVED 5-28-2005 
4/20/2005  COM - Complaint  4/21/2005   
4/20/2005  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  4/21/2005   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
3/31/2006  8:45  Status Conference 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
3/27/2006  F:Pete Bell  $4,531.13  One Time  Principal  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin Burrell