« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2005-006221 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Mroz
File Date: 4/13/2005 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Scott Williams 
Dawn Cody   Defendant  Female  Howard Gaines 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/31/2005  NDE - Notice Of Deposition  11/4/2005   
NOTE: FINAL 
9/14/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  9/14/2005   
9/6/2005  NOH - Notice Of Hearing  9/8/2005   
NOTE: ARBITRATION 
7/6/2005  NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure  7/7/2005   
6/24/2005  324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator  6/24/2005   
5/19/2005  ANS - Answer  5/23/2005   
NOTE: PAID 
5/19/2005  CER - Certificate  5/24/2005   
NOTE: OF AGREEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION 
5/12/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/13/2005   
NOTE: DAWN CODY SERVED 4/28/05 
4/13/2005  COM - Complaint  4/14/2005   
4/13/2005  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  4/14/2005   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center