« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2005-006120 Judge: Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned
File Date: 4/12/2005 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
D M X Music Inc   Plaintiff    James Landon 
Fitigues Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/5/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  12/8/2005   
12/5/2005  DFJ - Default Judgment  12/12/2005   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
12/5/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  12/13/2005   
NOTE: VERIFIED 
12/5/2005  ORD - Order  12/15/2005   
NOTE: THAT PLAINTIFF'S IS REINSTATED AND PLAINTIFF IS AUTHORIZED TO CONCURRENTLY PROCEED WITH ITS DEFAULT APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT 
10/21/2005  MOT - Motion  10/26/2005   
NOTE: TO REINSTATE CASE AND BE AUTHORIZED TO PROCEED WITH DEFAULT JUDGMENT 
10/12/2005  323 - ME: Jdgmnt Dismissal - Lack Srv  10/12/2005   
9/14/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  9/14/2005   
8/5/2005  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  7/13/2012   
8/3/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  8/8/2005   
8/3/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  8/10/2005   
NOTE: VERIFIED 
7/20/2005  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  7/20/2005   
6/20/2005  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  6/27/2005   
4/12/2005  COM - Complaint  4/14/2005   
4/12/2005  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  4/14/2005   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
12/5/2005  F:D M X Music Inc  $360.80  One Time  Costs   
  A: Fitigues Inc         
12/5/2005  F:D M X Music Inc  $50,125.01  One Time  Principal   
  A: Fitigues Inc         
click here for Self-Service Center