« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-005694
Judge:
Pineda, Susanna
File Date:
4/8/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael A Bosco
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
MARK BOSCO
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Phoenix City
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Mary Chang
Party Name
West Coast Realty Services Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Jason Sherman
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
6/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
6/23/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED
Filing Date
6/2/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
6/6/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 05/08/06
Filing Date
5/24/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
5/26/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/15/2006
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(5)
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/PAID
Filing Date
5/4/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/5/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS TO THE CITY OF PHOENIX AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF EXCESS PROCEEDS AFTER TRUSTEE SALE TO CITY OF PHOENIX PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812/ CO-CHG
Filing Date
4/11/2006
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
4/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/10/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
1/23/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/14/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 04/08/05
Filing Date
4/12/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/12/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/15/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.