« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-000521
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Herrod
File Date:
1/18/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
U S Collections West Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Alan Zimmerman
Party Name
Valora Lee
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2005
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
8/29/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2005
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
8/4/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2005
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
6/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2005
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
6/3/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNTIL 08/18/05
Filing Date
5/13/2005
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/17/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DATE FOR PERFECTING SEVICE OF PROCESS OF DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
4/27/2005
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
4/27/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2005
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
2/11/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2005
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
1/19/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.