« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-000017
Judge:
Albrecht, Richard
File Date:
1/3/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Arizona State Registrar Of Contractors
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
David Dir
Party Name
Robert Joseph Petrone
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beverly Petrone
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2006
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
7/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2005
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
4/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2005
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
4/21/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
3/11/2005
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
3/18/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Filing Date
2/15/2005
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
2/16/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND RE MILITARY SERVICE
Filing Date
1/25/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/28/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT JOSEPH PETRONE AND BEVERLY PETRONE SERVED 01/18/05
Filing Date
1/3/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/5/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2005
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
1/5/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
4/14/2005
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Arizona State Registrar Of Contractors
A: Robert Joseph Petrone
Amount
$471.65
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Satisfied
Date
4/14/2005
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Arizona State Registrar Of Contractors
A: Robert Joseph Petrone
Amount
$5,717.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied
Date
4/14/2005
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Arizona State Registrar Of Contractors
A: Robert Joseph Petrone
Amount
$56.41
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Satisfied
Date
4/14/2005
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Arizona State Registrar Of Contractors
A: Robert Joseph Petrone
Amount
$507.72
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied