« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-093001 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Rogers
File Date: 11/18/2004 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Kenrick Samuels   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/27/2006  MOT - Motion  1/31/2006   
NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE FOR PERFECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS 
1/27/2006  MOT - Motion  2/2/2006   
NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE FOR PERFECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS 
7/28/2005  NOT - Notice  8/3/2005   
NOTE: OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT 
7/13/2005  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  7/14/2005   
6/27/2005  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  6/28/2005   
6/21/2005  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  6/24/2005   
4/27/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/27/2005   
3/15/2005  OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service  3/18/2005   
3/11/2005  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  3/14/2005   
3/8/2005  MOT - Motion  3/9/2005   
NOTE: TO EXTEND DATE FOR PERFECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS 
2/23/2005  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  2/23/2005   
1/31/2005  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  2/1/2005   
12/30/2004  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  1/4/2005   
11/18/2004  COM - Complaint  11/19/2004   
11/18/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  11/19/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center