« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-093000 Judge: Civil Court Adm 01, Calendar
File Date: 11/18/2004 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Jake G Blackburn   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/2/2005  047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal  11/2/2005   
4/27/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/27/2005   
3/8/2005  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  3/9/2005   
3/8/2005  NOT - Notice  3/9/2005   
NOTE: OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 
2/15/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/16/2005   
11/18/2004  COM - Complaint  11/19/2004   
11/18/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  11/19/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center