« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-092794 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Talamante
File Date: 10/28/2004 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
John H Greene   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Kimberly Greene   Defendant  Female  Leanne Martin 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/14/2005  ORD - Order  6/27/2005   
NOTE: VACATING HEARING AND DISMISSING CUASE OF ACTION 
6/8/2005  399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award  6/8/2005   
4/6/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/6/2005   
3/21/2005  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  3/23/2005   
2/24/2005  NOH - Notice Of Hearing  3/7/2005   
NOTE: ARBITRATION 
2/16/2005  NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy  2/28/2005   
2/2/2005  NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure  2/4/2005   
2/2/2005  CER - Certificate  2/8/2005   
NOTE: OF MAILING 
1/28/2005  324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator  1/28/2005   
12/2/2004  SUM - Summons  12/6/2004   
11/24/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2004   
NOTE: JOHN AND KIMBERLY GREENE SERVED 11/09/04 
11/23/2004  ANS - Answer  12/8/2004   
11/23/2004  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  12/8/2004   
10/28/2004  COM - Complaint  10/29/2004   
NOTE: BREACH OF CONTRACT 
10/28/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  10/29/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center