« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-092793 Judge: Benny, Margaret
File Date: 10/28/2004 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Gaylynn Godwin   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/7/2008  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  3/11/2008   
2/8/2008  ORD - Order  2/12/2008   
NOTE: THAT THE DEFENDANTS/JUDGMENT DEBTORS GAYLYNN GODWIN AKA WOOLEY APPEAR BEFORE COMMISSIONER VIRGINIA L RICHTER AND ANSWER CONCERNING THE PROPERTY OF THE DEFENDANTS/JUDGMENT DEBTORS BEFORE THIS COURT ON THE 10TH DAY OF MARCH 2008 AT 1:30 O'CLOCK PM IN THE 
1/29/2008  MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear  2/6/2008   
6/12/2006  MOT - Motion  6/14/2006   
NOTE: FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS 
5/17/2006  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  5/17/2006   
4/7/2006  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  4/7/2006   
3/13/2006  ORD - Order  3/14/2006   
NOTE: TO APPEAR BEFORE COMMISSIONER ON APRIL 3RD 2006 @ 1:30 PM 
3/3/2006  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/8/2006   
1/23/2006  MOT - Motion  1/26/2006   
NOTE: FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS 
7/26/2005  DFJ - Default Judgment  8/2/2005   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
4/6/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/6/2005   
1/20/2005  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  1/24/2005   
NOTE: AND NOTICEE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/24/2005   
12/15/2004  NOT - Notice  12/20/2004   
NOTE: OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMETN BY DEFAULT 
12/15/2004  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  12/16/2004   
12/14/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/15/2004   
NOTE: GAYLYNN AND JOHN DOE GODWIN SERVED 11/22/04 
10/28/2004  COM - Complaint  10/29/2004   
10/28/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  10/29/2004   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/3/2006  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
5/15/2006  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
7/17/2006  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
3/10/2008  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
7/26/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $525.00  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: Gaylynn Godwin         
7/26/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $245.00  One Time  Costs   
  A: Gaylynn Godwin         
7/26/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $1,042.45  One Time  Interest   
  A: Gaylynn Godwin         
7/26/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $25,478.35  One Time  Principal   
  A: Gaylynn Godwin         
click here for Law Library Resource Center