« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-092792 Judge: Benny, Margaret
File Date: 10/28/2004 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Ed Ruhe   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Pam Ruhe   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/19/2010  ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment  5/28/2010   
7/19/2006  039 - ME: Judgment Debtor Exam  7/19/2006   
7/14/2006  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/17/2006   
6/12/2006  MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear  6/13/2006   
6/1/2006  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/1/2006   
4/12/2006  RES - Response  4/19/2006   
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REFILE DEBTORS' EXAMINATION 
4/7/2006  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  4/7/2006   
4/3/2006  ANS - Answer  4/4/2006  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: OBJECTION RESCHEDULE & REFILE 
3/13/2006  ORD - Order  3/14/2006   
NOTE: TO APPEAR BEFORE COMMISSIONER ON APRIL 3RD 2006 @ 1:30 PM 
3/3/2006  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/8/2006   
1/23/2006  MOT - Motion  1/26/2006   
NOTE: FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS 
11/29/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/2/2005   
7/26/2005  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  7/28/2005   
6/7/2005  JUD - Judgment  6/9/2005   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
4/6/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/6/2005   
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/21/2005   
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  1/24/2005   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
12/8/2004  NOT - Notice  12/15/2004   
NOTE: OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 
12/8/2004  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  12/14/2004   
11/24/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2004   
NOTE: ED AND PAM RUHE SERVED 11/11/04 
10/28/2004  COM - Complaint  10/29/2004   
NOTE: BREACH OF CONTRACT 
10/28/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  10/29/2004   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/3/2006  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
7/17/2006  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
5/19/2010  F:U S Collections West Inc  $25,847.44  One Time  Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment  Modified 
  A: Ed Ruhe         
  A: Pam Ruhe         
6/7/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $577.50  One Time  Attorney Fee  Modified 
  A: Ed Ruhe         
  A: Pam Ruhe         
6/7/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $245.00  One Time  Costs  Modified 
  A: Ed Ruhe         
  A: Pam Ruhe         
6/7/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $16,442.71  One Time  Principal  Modified 
  A: Ed Ruhe         
  A: Pam Ruhe         
click here for Law Library Resource Center