« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-092791 Judge: Rogers, Joshua
File Date: 10/28/2004 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
John A Graves   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Veronica Graves   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Iron Eagle Motorcycles Inc   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/14/2006  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  8/16/2006  Garnishee Defendant(4)  
8/8/2006  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/9/2006   
7/20/2006  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  7/21/2006   
11/2/2005  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  11/4/2005   
7/19/2005  049 - ME: Judgment Signed  7/19/2005   
7/14/2005  JUD - Judgment  7/18/2005   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
5/25/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  5/27/2005   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
5/25/2005  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  5/27/2005   
5/12/2005  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/12/2005   
4/29/2005  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  5/9/2005   
4/21/2005  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  5/9/2005   
4/15/2005  324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator  4/15/2005   
4/6/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/6/2005   
3/4/2005  MOT - Motion  3/16/2005   
NOTE: FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
1/20/2005  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  1/24/2005   
12/2/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/3/2004   
12/2/2004  SUM - Summons  6/18/2012   
12/1/2004  ANS - Answer  12/3/2004  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: PAID 
10/28/2004  COM - Complaint  10/29/2004   
NOTE: BREACH OF CONTRACT 
10/28/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  10/29/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
7/14/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $1,076.25  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: John A Graves         
7/14/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $240.00  One Time  Costs   
  A: John A Graves         
7/14/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $13,139.76  One Time  Principal   
  A: John A Graves         
click here for Law Library Resource Center