« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-092789 Judge: Mandell, Michael
File Date: 10/28/2004 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Herbert Reed   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Denise Reed   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/6/2006  022 - ME: Order Signed  11/6/2006   
11/2/2006  ORD - Order  11/16/2006   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT 
10/11/2006  MVJ - Motion To Vacate Judgment  10/17/2006   
NOTE: DEFAULT 
9/28/2006  RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment  9/29/2006   
9/18/2006  OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien  9/22/2006   
8/4/2006  APL - Application  8/7/2006   
NOTE: FOR ORDER CONTINUE LIEN 
8/4/2006  APL - Application  8/7/2006   
NOTE: FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN 
7/20/2006  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/21/2006   
NOTE: HERBERT REED AND DENISE REED SERVED 07/07/2006 
7/20/2006  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  7/21/2006   
6/21/2006  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  6/23/2006   
2/1/2006  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  2/3/2006   
11/21/2005  MOT - Motion  11/23/2005   
NOTE: FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS 
5/2/2005  DFJ - Default Judgment  5/9/2005   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
4/6/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/6/2005   
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/21/2005   
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  1/24/2005   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
12/3/2004  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  12/3/2004   
12/3/2004  NOT - Notice  12/9/2004   
NOTE: OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 
11/24/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2004   
NOTE: HERBERT AND DENISE REED SERVED 11/04/04 
10/28/2004  COM - Complaint  10/29/2004   
NOTE: BREACH OF CONTRACT 
10/28/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  10/29/2004   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/23/2006  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
5/2/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $577.50  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: Herbert Reed         
  A: Denise Reed         
5/2/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $260.00  One Time  Costs   
  A: Herbert Reed         
  A: Denise Reed         
5/2/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $4,050.09  One Time  Interest   
  A: Herbert Reed         
  A: Denise Reed         
5/2/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $27,025.31  One Time  Principal   
  A: Herbert Reed         
  A: Denise Reed         
click here for Law Library Resource Center