« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-024803 Judge: Brnovich, Susan
File Date: 12/30/2004 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Antonio M Garcia   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Monica G Garcia   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/8/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  6/8/2005   
5/13/2005  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  5/13/2005   
5/2/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/3/2005   
NOTE: ANTONIO GARCIA SERVED 2/8/05 
5/2/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/3/2005   
NOTE: MONICA GARCIA SERVED 2/23/05 
4/6/2005  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  4/6/2005   
2/8/2005  MOT - Motion  2/14/2005   
NOTE: FOR CHANGE OF VENUE TO PIMA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT 
12/30/2004  COM - Complaint  1/4/2005   
NOTE: BREACH OF CONTRACT 
12/30/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  1/4/2005   
12/30/2004  LET - Letter  1/4/2005   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center