« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2004-024347
Judge:
Minder, Scott
File Date:
12/22/2004
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael A Bosco
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
MARK BOSCO
Party Name
Doug Todd
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
Claimant
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
7/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 2-17-07
Filing Date
7/20/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment
Docket Date
5/9/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED AND REINSTATE CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
3/14/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/14/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATE CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
2/13/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/15/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
2/13/2006
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
2/13/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2005
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
11/23/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/28/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOUG TODD SERVED 12/22/04
Filing Date
1/25/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/28/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/23/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2004
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/23/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.