« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-021666 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Mroz
File Date: 11/15/2004 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Erika S Douglas   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Noah T Douglas   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/17/2005  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  5/19/2005   
5/17/2005  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  6/8/2005   
4/20/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/20/2005   
1/20/2005  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  1/24/2005   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  AFD - Affidavit On Default  1/24/2005   
NOTE: WITHOUT HEARING 
12/20/2004  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  12/22/2004   
12/20/2004  NOT - Notice  12/23/2004   
NOTE: OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 
12/2/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/3/2004   
12/2/2004  SUM - Summons  12/6/2004   
11/15/2004  COM - Complaint  11/17/2004   
11/15/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  11/17/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center