« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2004-021665
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Herrod
File Date:
11/15/2004
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
U S Collections West Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Alan Zimmerman
Party Name
James Guerrero
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2005
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2005
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/8/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2005
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
4/20/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2005
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
11/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2005
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
1/24/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
1/20/2005
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/24/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND AFFIDAVIT FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT WITHOUT HEARING
Filing Date
1/20/2005
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
1/24/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT BE DEFAULT WITHOUT HEARING
Filing Date
12/30/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/4/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
JAMES GUERRERO SERVED 11/21/04
Filing Date
12/23/2004
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/28/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
Filing Date
12/23/2004
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
12/28/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2004
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/6/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/3/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/17/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2004
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
11/17/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.