« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-021108 Judge: Mandell, Michael
File Date: 11/4/2004 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
William Werner   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/25/2007  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  10/31/2007   
6/7/2005  DFJ - Default Judgment  6/16/2005   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
5/25/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  5/27/2005   
5/25/2005  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  5/27/2005   
5/25/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  5/27/2005   
5/25/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  5/27/2005   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
5/3/2005  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  5/5/2005   
5/3/2005  NOT - Notice  5/12/2005   
NOTE: OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 
5/2/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/3/2005   
NOTE: WILLIAM WERNER SERVED 4/11/05 
4/13/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/13/2005   
3/3/2005  ORD - Order  3/17/2005   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS 
3/3/2005  OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service  3/14/2005   
NOTE: OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS UNTIL JUNE 3, 2005 
2/25/2005  MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service  3/2/2005   
2/9/2005  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  2/9/2005   
1/20/2005  MOT - Motion  1/24/2005   
NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE FOR PERFECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS 
12/30/2004  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  1/4/2005   
12/2/2004  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  12/3/2004   
11/4/2004  COM - Complaint  11/5/2004   
NOTE: BREACH OF CONTRACT 
11/4/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  11/5/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
6/7/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $682.50  One Time  Attorney Fee  Satisfied 
  A: William Werner         
6/7/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $270.00  One Time  Costs  Satisfied 
  A: William Werner         
6/7/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $21,701.91  One Time  Principal  Satisfied 
  A: William Werner         
click here for Law Library Resource Center