« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-018523 Judge: Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned
File Date: 10/1/2004 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Jeannette W Graham   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/18/2005  AFF - Affidavit  3/23/2005   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT WITHOUT HEARING 
3/18/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  3/23/2005   
3/18/2005  DFJ - Default Judgment  3/24/2005   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
3/18/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  3/28/2005   
NOTE: & NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
3/18/2005  ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs  3/28/2005   
3/9/2005  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  3/9/2005   
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  1/24/2005   
1/20/2005  SOC - Statement Of Costs  1/24/2005   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
12/3/2004  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  12/7/2004   
12/3/2004  NOT - Notice  12/9/2004   
NOTE: OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 
11/24/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2004   
NOTE: JEANNETTE GRAHAM SERVED 11/11/04 
10/1/2004  COM - Complaint  10/4/2004   
10/1/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  10/4/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
3/18/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $490.00  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: Jeannette W Graham         
3/18/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $245.00  One Time  Costs   
  A: Jeannette W Graham         
3/18/2005  F:U S Collections West Inc  $12,848.98  One Time  Principal   
  A: Jeannette W Graham         
click here for Law Library Resource Center