« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2004-018521
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Herrod
File Date:
10/1/2004
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
U S Collections West Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Alan Zimmerman
Party Name
Chelsea C Lewis
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Lloyd L Lewis
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2005
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
3/9/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2005
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/4/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/24/2005
Description
STD - Stipulation To/For Dismissal
Docket Date
3/8/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/18/2005
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
2/18/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/1/2005
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
1/25/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/31/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
Filing Date
1/25/2005
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
5/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2005
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
1/5/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHELEA AND LLOYD LEWIS SERVED 12/27/04
Filing Date
12/2/2004
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
12/3/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/4/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2004
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
10/4/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.