« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2004-017284
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
9/10/2004
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
U S Collections West Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Alan Zimmerman
Party Name
Mike E Abel
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2007
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE
Filing Date
6/14/2007
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
6/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2005
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
8/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2005
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
6/3/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2005
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
5/24/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2005
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
5/9/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
4/13/2005
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
4/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT WITHOUT HEARING
Filing Date
4/13/2005
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
4/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
4/13/2005
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
4/15/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2005
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
4/15/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/22/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
Filing Date
2/17/2005
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
2/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2005
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
2/16/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/26/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2004
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
1/5/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS UNTIL MARCH 14, 2005
Filing Date
12/22/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/4/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
12/20/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/23/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE FOR PERFECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
12/20/2004
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
12/27/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2004
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
12/15/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2004
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
12/15/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/14/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2004
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
9/14/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
4/25/2005
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  U S Collections West Inc
A: Mike E Abel
Amount
$682.50
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Satisfied
Date
4/25/2005
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  U S Collections West Inc
A: Mike E Abel
Amount
$265.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Satisfied
Date
4/25/2005
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  U S Collections West Inc
A: Mike E Abel
Amount
$12,222.97
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied