« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2004-016150
Judge:
Ryan, Timothy
File Date:
8/20/2004
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Hogan Manufacturing L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
STANLEY HAMMERMAN
Party Name
K M 2 Limited
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
K Morrill
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2006
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/22/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2006
Description
314 - ME: Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/23/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2006
Description
NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/15/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT TESTIMONY THE PARTIES PROPOSE JANUARY 31,2006 BY 5:P.M. AS THE DEADLINE FOR MUTUAL AND SIMULTANEOUS DISCLOSURE OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS AREAS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY
Filing Date
11/29/2005
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/29/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2005
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
12/2/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/24/2005
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/24/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2005
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
8/11/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2005
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
7/27/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2005
Description
073 - ME: Motion Withdrawn
Docket Date
2/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2005
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/26/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2005
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2004
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/30/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
12/23/2004
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/30/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
12/10/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/15/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
9/9/2004
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/14/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2004
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/13/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
8/26/2004
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/1/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/7/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
KM2 LIMITED SERVED 08-23-04
Filing Date
8/20/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/24/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2004
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/24/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/18/2005
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/20/2005
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/3/2006
Time
10:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.